AR HB1771 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Establish The Arkansas Litter Reduction And Deposit Beverage Container Recycling Act; To Require The Labeling Of Deposit Beverage Containers Sold In Arkansas; To Establish The Deposit Beverage Container Recycling Program.
Title
To Establish The Arkansas Litter Reduction And Deposit Beverage Container Recycling Act; To Require The Labeling Of Deposit Beverage Containers Sold In Arkansas; To Establish The Deposit Beverage Container Recycling Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment |
2019-04-02 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-02 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-25 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-25 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-25 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-03-11 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1771 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Bills/HB1771.pdf |