AR HB1717 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Notification that HB1717 is now Act 1144
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Notification that HB1717 is now Act 1144
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Repeal Certain Obsolete Laws Concerning Public Utilities And Regulated Industries Under Title 23 Of The Arkansas Code.
Title
To Repeal Certain Obsolete Laws Concerning Public Utilities And Regulated Industries Under Title 23 Of The Arkansas Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | House | Notification that HB1717 is now Act 1144 |
2013-04-10 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-09 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-04-01 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-06 | House | Filed |