AR HB1595 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Notification that HB1595 is now Act 735
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Notification that HB1595 is now Act 735
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Voting Machines.
Title
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Voting Machines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Notification that HB1595 is now Act 735 |
2021-04-14 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-13 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-09 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-08 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-03-02 | House | Filed |