AR HB1571 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Attorney Ad Litem Programs; And To Amend The Law Concerning Guardians Ad Litem And Attorneys Ad Litem.
Title
Concerning Attorney Ad Litem Programs; And To Amend The Law Concerning Guardians Ad Litem And Attorneys Ad Litem.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - Third Reading (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-03-11 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-04 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-04 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-02-25 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-02-25 | House | Filed |