AR HB1514 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Notification that HB1514 is now Act 535
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Allow For The Payment Of Mandatory Fees For Soldiers And Airmen Whose Tuition At An Institution Of Higher Education Is Free.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Allow For The Payment Of Mandatory Fees For Soldiers And Airmen Whose Tuition At An Institution Of Higher Education Is Free.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseNotification that HB1514 is now Act 535
2019-03-19HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-18HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-18HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-03-18SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-03-18SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-13SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-05SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-05SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-04HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-02-27HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-19HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-02-19HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback