AR HB1383 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Notification that HB1383 is now Act 494
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Notification that HB1383 is now Act 494
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Contract Bidding To Make The Requirements Uniform.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Contract Bidding To Make The Requirements Uniform.
Sponsors
Rep. John Vines [D] | Sen. David Wyatt [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | House | Notification that HB1383 is now Act 494 |
2013-03-20 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-03-20 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-03-20 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-02-25 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-02-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-02-15 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-02-15 | House | Filed |