AR HB1314 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-04 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-04 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Require The Arkansas Medicaid Program To Classify Doctors Of Optometry As Physicians Which Is The Same As Medicare And Insurance Carriers For Reimbursement.
Title
To Require The Arkansas Medicaid Program To Classify Doctors Of Optometry As Physicians Which Is The Same As Medicare And Insurance Carriers For Reimbursement.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Eubanks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | House | Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-04-04 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2023-03-27 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-03-27 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-03-27 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-03-27 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-01-30 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS |
2023-01-27 | House | Filed |