AR HB1257 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Authorize And Clarify The Method Of Releasing Claims And Enrollment Data By Health Insurers That Provide Healthcare Coverage To Eligible Individuals In The Arkansas Works Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Authorize And Clarify The Method Of Releasing Claims And Enrollment Data By Health Insurers That Provide Healthcare Coverage To Eligible Individuals In The Arkansas Works Program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseWITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
2019-03-28HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-28HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-28HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-26HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-01-28HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-01-24HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback