AR HB1251 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Definition Of "practice Of Optometry"; And To Modernize The Practice Of Optometry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Definition Of "practice Of Optometry"; And To Modernize The Practice Of Optometry.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 70 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-03-20HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-03-20HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-03-20SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-03-20SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-19SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-06SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-06SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-06HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-05HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-04HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-04HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-04HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-01-24HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-01-24HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback