AR HB1071 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Notification that HB1071 is now Act 836
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Notification that HB1071 is now Act 836
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Department Of Transformation And Shared Services - Division Of Information Systems Appropriation For The 2021-2022 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Department Of Transformation And Shared Services - Division Of Information Systems Appropriation For The 2021-2022 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 83 N: 6 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 83 N: 6 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | Notification that HB1071 is now Act 836 |
2021-04-20 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-19 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-19 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Returned to the House as Passed. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-14 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-04-14 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-13 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-04-08 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-15 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-15 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-15 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-01-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2021-01-05 | House | Filed |