AR HB1061 | 2014 | 89th General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-25 - Notification that HB1061 is now Act 152
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Pulaski Technical College Appropriation For The 2014-2015 Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Pulaski Technical College Appropriation For The 2014-2015 Fiscal Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-25HouseNotification that HB1061 is now Act 152
2014-02-20HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2014-02-19HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2014-02-19HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2014-02-19SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2014-02-19SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2014-02-19SenateRead the third time and passed.
2014-02-19SenateRules suspended.
2014-02-19SenateConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2014-02-18SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2014-02-18SenateReceived from the House.
2014-02-18HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2014-02-18HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2014-02-18HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2014-02-18HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2014-02-13HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2014-02-10HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2014-02-05HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback