AR HB1022 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning When Lighted Lamps Are Required On Certain Types Of Vehicles And Vessels.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning When Lighted Lamps Are Required On Certain Types Of Vehicles And Vessels.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 19 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-02-02 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-01-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-01-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2020-12-04 | House | Filed |