AR HB1012 | 2014 | 89th General Assembly Fiscal

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-20 - Notification that HB1012 is now Act 41
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The Economic Development Commission - Movie/film Office;reappropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The Economic Development Commission - Movie/film Office;reappropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-20HouseNotification that HB1012 is now Act 41
2014-02-19HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2014-02-18HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2014-02-18HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2014-02-18SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2014-02-18SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2014-02-18SenateRead the third time and passed.
2014-02-18SenateRules suspended.
2014-02-18SenateConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2014-02-13SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2014-02-13SenateReceived from the House.
2014-02-13HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2014-02-13HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2014-02-13HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2014-02-13HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2014-02-12HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2014-02-10HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
2014-01-31HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback