AR HB1011 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly 1st Special

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-21 - Notification that HB1011 is now Act 6
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Create A More Sustainable System Of Health Insurance Benefits For Public School Employees And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create A More Sustainable System Of Health Insurance Benefits For Public School Employees And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-10-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-10-21HouseNotification that HB1011 is now Act 6
2013-10-21HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2013-10-19HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2013-10-19HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-10-19SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2013-10-19SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-10-19SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-10-18SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2013-10-18SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
2013-10-18SenateReceived from the House.
2013-10-18HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-10-18HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-10-17HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2013-10-17HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2013-10-17HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback