AR HB1002 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-13 - Notification that HB1002 is now Act 47
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-13 - Notification that HB1002 is now Act 47
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Authority Of The Arkansas Ethics Commission To Interpret Arkansas Constitution, Amendment 94; To Amend Arkansas Laws Resulting From An Initiated Act; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
Concerning The Authority Of The Arkansas Ethics Commission To Interpret Arkansas Constitution, Amendment 94; To Amend Arkansas Laws Resulting From An Initiated Act; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-13 | House | Notification that HB1002 is now Act 47 |
2015-02-12 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-02-11 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-02-11 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-02-02 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-02-02 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-01-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-01-21 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2015-01-21 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-01-21 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-01-12 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS |
2014-11-17 | House | Filed |