AR HB1001 | 2020 | 92nd General Assembly 1st Special

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 38-18)
Status: Passed on March 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-28 - Notification that HB1001 is now Act 2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Create The Covid-19 Rainy Day Fund; To Transfer Funds To The Covid-19 Rainy Day Fund; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Create The Covid-19 Rainy Day Fund; To Transfer Funds To The Covid-19 Rainy Day Fund; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-28HouseNotification that HB1001 is now Act 2
2020-03-28HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2020-03-28HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2020-03-28HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2020-03-28SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2020-03-28SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2020-03-28SenateRead the third time and passed.
2020-03-27SenateRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
2020-03-27SenateReceived from the House.
2020-03-27HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2020-03-27HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2020-03-26HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2020-03-26HouseRules Suspended
2020-03-26HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee of the Whole
2020-03-25HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback