AL SJR4 | 2016 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-25 - Assigned Act No. 2016-455.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-25 - Assigned Act No. 2016-455.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Horn, William Fred, recognized
Title
Horn, William Fred, recognized
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-24 - House - Williams (JD) motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 19 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-25 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2016-455. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-08-25 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Second House Concurs in Executive Amendment |
2016-08-24 | House | Williams (JD) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 56 |
2016-08-24 | House | House of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Executive Amendment Offered |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Forwarded to Governor |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-08-18 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2016-08-18 | House | Johnson (R) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2016-08-18 | House | Reported from Rules |
2016-08-16 | House | Received in House of Representatives and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Reported from Rules |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Introduced and referred to the Senate committee on Rules |