AL SB79 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-105.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Assigned Act No. 2019-105.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
County housing authorities, bonds, electronic posting of notices to potential purchasers of bonds, eliminate bids from being advertised for three weeks, Secs. 24-1-71, 24-1-83, 41-4-16 am'd.
Title
County housing authorities, bonds, electronic posting of notices to potential purchasers of bonds, eliminate bids from being advertised for three weeks, Secs. 24-1-71, 24-1-83, 41-4-16 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2019-105. |
2019-04-30 | House | Signature Requested |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2019-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 396 |
2019-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-03 | House | Rereferred from SG to BA&C |
2019-03-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 24 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Holley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 23 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Holley motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Governmental Affairs first Substitute Offered |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |