AL SB490 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Delivered to Governor at 2:06 p.m. on June 1, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Delivered to Governor at 2:06 p.m. on June 1, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Marion Co., court costs, additional in domestic violence cases in circuit, district, and municipal courts, distrib. to Coalition Against Domestic Violence, effective subject to constitutional amendment
Title
Marion Co., court costs, additional in domestic violence cases in circuit, district, and municipal courts, distrib. to Coalition Against Domestic Violence, effective subject to constitutional amendment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 51 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Delivered to Governor at 2:06 p.m. on June 1, 2011 | |
2011-06-01 | Assigned Act No. 2011-653. | |
2011-06-01 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-01 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-01 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-01 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1010 | |
2011-06-01 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation | |
2011-05-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 781 | |
2011-05-26 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-24 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |