AL SB473 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Delivered to Governor at 1:23 p.m. on May 1, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Delivered to Governor at 1:23 p.m. on May 1, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Barbour Co., county board of education, School Tax District No. 1, ad valorem tax, increased, distrib. for education, referendum
Title
Barbour Co., county board of education, School Tax District No. 1, ad valorem tax, increased, distrib. for education, referendum
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 46 Abs: 44) [FAIL]
2012-04-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Delivered to Governor at 1:23 p.m. on May 1, 2012 | |
2012-05-01 | Assigned Act No. 2012-301. | |
2012-05-01 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-01 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-01 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-01 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1062 | |
2012-05-01 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-26 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation | |
2012-04-19 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 657 | |
2012-04-19 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-12 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-05 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |