AL SB420 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Forwarded to Governor at 11:55 a.m. on May 9, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Forwarded to Governor at 11:55 a.m. on May 9, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Baldwin Co., leasing tax, distrib. to Historic Blakeley Authority, further provided for, Sec. 45-2-244.183 am'd.
Title
Baldwin Co., leasing tax, distrib. to Historic Blakeley Authority, further provided for, Sec. 45-2-244.183 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 71 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 11:55 a.m. on May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-09 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-243. |
2013-05-09 | House | Signature Requested |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2013-05-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1180 |
2013-05-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-05-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 757 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |