AL SB363 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Delivered to Governor at 4:15 p.m. on April 14, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Delivered to Governor at 4:15 p.m. on April 14, 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Class 7 municipalities, council manager form of government, alternate procedure for adoption to be operative in November 2012, referendum prior to January 1, 2011, Sec. 11-43A-3.3 added; Secs. 11-43A-16, 11-43A-18, 11-43A-32 am'd.
Title
Class 7 municipalities, council manager form of government, alternate procedure for adoption to be operative in November 2012, referendum prior to January 1, 2011, Sec. 11-43A-3.3 added; Secs. 11-43A-16, 11-43A-18, 11-43A-32 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Delivered to Governor at 4:15 p.m. on April 14, 2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Assigned Act No. 2010-544. | |
2010-04-14 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-14 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-14 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-14 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1061 | |
2010-03-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-04-14 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-16 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government | |
2010-02-11 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 147 | |
2010-02-11 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-09 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-02 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |