AL SB358 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security with 1 substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms, prohibitions on state enforcement of certain federal firearm laws, provided

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms, prohibitions on state enforcement of certain federal firearm laws, provided

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 993 (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - SBIR: Allen motion to Adopt Roll Call 992 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27HousePending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security with 1 substitute
2021-04-27HousePublic Safety and Homeland Security first Substitute Offered
2021-04-27HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2021-04-15HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
2021-04-15SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 993
2021-04-15SenateThird Reading Passed
2021-04-06SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-03-30SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB349 (Same As) 2021-02-04 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
SB157 (Same As) 2021-02-02 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB358&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB358-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/210571-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/210983-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/213745-2.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42543.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42343.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41979.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42912.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42938.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=658601&VOTE=992&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20SB358&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=658639&VOTE=993&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments 750

feedback