AL SB339 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-19 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
Pending: House Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-19 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
Pending: House Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Highway Authority, issuance of $650 million in revenue bonds for highways, roads, and bridges, Public Road and Bridge Construction Council created, duties to Transportation Department
Title
Highway Authority, issuance of $650 million in revenue bonds for highways, roads, and bridges, Public Road and Bridge Construction Council created, duties to Transportation Department
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-12 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - Bussman motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - Bussman motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure | |
2012-04-12 | Engrossed | |
2012-04-12 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 592 | |
2012-04-12 | Bussman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 591 | |
2012-04-12 | Holtzclaw Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-12 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-12 | Marsh to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted | |
2012-04-12 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2012-02-28 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-16 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |