AL SB214 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-09 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 474
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-09 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 474
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Gaming, Alabama Education Lottery established, Alabama Education Lottery Corporation and Alabama Gaming Commission estab. to license and regulate gaming, negotiation of compact with Poarch Creek Indians Authority, const. amend.
Title
Gaming, Alabama Education Lottery established, Alabama Education Lottery Corporation and Alabama Gaming Commission estab. to license and regulate gaming, negotiation of compact with Poarch Creek Indians Authority, const. amend.
Sponsors
Sen. Del Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 474 (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt Roll Call 473 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt Roll Call 472 (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Hatcher motion to Adopt Roll Call 471 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 470 (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt Roll Call 469 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt Roll Call 468 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - SBIR: Marsh motion to Adopt Roll Call 217 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt Roll Call 473 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt Roll Call 472 (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Hatcher motion to Adopt Roll Call 471 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 470 (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt Roll Call 469 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt Roll Call 468 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - SBIR: Marsh motion to Adopt Roll Call 217 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 474 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Marsh motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Williams Amendment Offered |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 473 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Figures Amendment Offered |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Figures motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 472 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Figures Amendment Offered |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Hatcher motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 471 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Hatcher Amendment Offered |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 470 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Singleton Amendment Offered |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 469 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Jones Amendment Offered |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 468 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Marsh first Substitute Offered |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Lost in house of origin |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Marsh motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism |