AL SB214 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 474
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Gaming, Alabama Education Lottery established, Alabama Education Lottery Corporation and Alabama Gaming Commission estab. to license and regulate gaming, negotiation of compact with Poarch Creek Indians Authority, const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gaming, Alabama Education Lottery established, Alabama Education Lottery Corporation and Alabama Gaming Commission estab. to license and regulate gaming, negotiation of compact with Poarch Creek Indians Authority, const. amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 474 (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt Roll Call 473 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt Roll Call 472 (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Hatcher motion to Adopt Roll Call 471 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 470 (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt Roll Call 469 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt Roll Call 468 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - SBIR: Marsh motion to Adopt Roll Call 217 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 474
2021-03-09SenateMarsh motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2021-03-09SenateWilliams Amendment Offered
2021-03-09SenateMarsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 473
2021-03-09SenateFigures Amendment Offered
2021-03-09SenateFigures motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 472
2021-03-09SenateFigures Amendment Offered
2021-03-09SenateHatcher motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 471
2021-03-09SenateHatcher Amendment Offered
2021-03-09SenateSingleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 470
2021-03-09SenateSingleton Amendment Offered
2021-03-09SenateMarsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 469
2021-03-09SenateJones Amendment Offered
2021-03-09SenateMarsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 468
2021-03-09SenateMarsh first Substitute Offered
2021-03-09SenateLost in house of origin
2021-02-11SenateMarsh motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2021-02-11SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2021-02-10SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-02-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB214&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/SB214-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/211384-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/211496-4.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/211483-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/211504-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/211536-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/211531-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/211502-3.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41727.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41614.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=645499&VOTE=217&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20SB214&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=650351&VOTE=468&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=650354&VOTE=469&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=650357&VOTE=470&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=650360&VOTE=471&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=650366&VOTE=472&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=650371&VOTE=473&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=650378&VOTE=474&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback