AL SB168 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Assigned Act No. 2022-154.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Assigned Act No. 2022-154.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Controlled substances, drug paraphernalia, exception for items used to test for the presence of fentanyl drugs, Sec. 13A-12-260 am'd.
Title
Controlled substances, drug paraphernalia, exception for items used to test for the presence of fentanyl drugs, Sec. 13A-12-260 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim McClendon [R] | Sen. William Beasley [D] | Sen. Tom Butler [R] | Sen. Linda Coleman-Madison [D] |
Sen. Sam Givhan [R] | Sen. Kirk Hatcher [D] | Sen. Jack Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 525 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - HBIR: Treadaway motion to Adopt Roll Call 524 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 201 (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - SBIR: McClendon motion to Adopt Roll Call 200 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - HBIR: Treadaway motion to Adopt Roll Call 524 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 201 (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - SBIR: McClendon motion to Adopt Roll Call 200 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-154. |
2022-03-10 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-03-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 525 |
2022-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-10 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 201 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare |
Same As/Similar To
HB187 (Same As) 2022-03-09 - Treadaway motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote