AL SB148 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Ways and Means General Fund
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Ways and Means General Fund
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Veterinary Examiners, State Board of, daily stipend increased for board members, board authorized to increase stipend by rule, Sec. 34-29-67 am'd.
Title
Veterinary Examiners, State Board of, daily stipend increased for board members, board authorized to increase stipend by rule, Sec. 34-29-67 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Butler [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 727 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Butler motion to Adopt Roll Call 726 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - SBIR: Butler motion to Adopt Roll Call 455 (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Butler motion to Adopt Roll Call 726 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - SBIR: Butler motion to Adopt Roll Call 455 (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Ways and Means General Fund |
2022-04-05 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-29 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Engrossed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 727 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Butler motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 726 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Butler Amendment Offered |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Butler motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |