AL HJR811 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Forwarded to Governor at 2:40 p.m. on April 8, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Forwarded to Governor at 2:40 p.m. on April 8, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Savell, Katherine Elizabeth, commended
Title
Savell, Katherine Elizabeth, commended
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Forwarded to Governor at 2:40 p.m. on April 8, 2010. | |
2010-04-08 | Assigned Act No. 2010-490 on 04/19/2010. | |
2010-04-08 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-04-08 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-08 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-08 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-08 | Smitherman motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-04-08 | Received in Senate | |
2010-04-06 | Guin motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-04-06 | Reported from Rules | |
2010-04-01 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |