AL HJR193 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-19 - Delivered to Governor at 5:30 p.m. on April 19, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-19 - Delivered to Governor at 5:30 p.m. on April 19, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative law enforcement medal of honor, joint session of Legislature called for presenting to law enforcement officers
Title
Legislative law enforcement medal of honor, joint session of Legislature called for presenting to law enforcement officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Delivered to Governor at 5:30 p.m. on April 19, 2011. | |
2011-04-19 | Assigned Act No. 2011-160 on 04/26/2011. | |
2011-04-19 | Enrolled | |
2011-04-19 | Signature Requested | |
2011-04-19 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-04-19 | Passed Second House | |
2011-04-19 | Beason motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-04-19 | Reported from Rules | |
2011-03-31 | Received in Senate and referred to the Senate committee on Rules | |
2011-03-29 | Galliher motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-03-29 | Reported from Rules | |
2011-03-24 | Introduced and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Rules |