AL HJR1 | 2016 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 17 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-17 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on August 17 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-17 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Governor, committee appointed to notify that Legislature is in session
Title
Governor, committee appointed to notify that Legislature is in session
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-17 | House | Enrolled |
2016-08-17 | House | Forwarded to Executive Department on August 17, 2016 |
2016-08-17 | House | Enrolled |
2016-08-17 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-08-16 | House | Passed Second House |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Received in Senate |
2016-08-15 | House | Chair appoints Whorton (R), Ledbetter and South |
2016-08-15 | House | Gaston motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2016-08-15 | House | Introduced |