AL HB630 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fayette Co., judge of probate, special recording and indexing fees, Sec. 45-29-83.47 am'd.
Title
Fayette Co., judge of probate, special recording and indexing fees, Sec. 45-29-83.47 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Dial table Dial motion to recommit (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 67 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Dial table Dial motion to recommit (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 67 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-408. |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1193 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Dial table Dial motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 969 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2013-05-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1051 |
2013-05-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-30 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |