AL HB625 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Gulf Shores, corp. limits alt.
Title
Gulf Shores, corp. limits alt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 30 Abs: 31) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Further Consideration | |
2011-06-02 | Keahey motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2011-05-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2011-05-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 883 | |
2011-05-26 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-24 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation |