AL HB585 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Delivered to Governor at 10:51 a.m. on May 26, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Delivered to Governor at 10:51 a.m. on May 26, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Shelby Co., solicitor's fee, portion distrib. to municipal court clerk when case originates in municipal court, Act 2007-306, 2007 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Title
Shelby Co., solicitor's fee, portion distrib. to municipal court clerk when case originates in municipal court, Act 2007-306, 2007 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2011-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 36 Abs: 29) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor at 10:51 a.m. on May 26, 2011. | |
2011-05-26 | Assigned Act No. 2011-332 on 06/02/2011. | |
2011-05-26 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-05-26 | Signature Requested | |
2011-05-25 | Enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | Passed Second House | |
2011-05-25 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 764 | |
2011-05-25 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-24 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2011-05-04 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 609 | |
2011-05-04 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-28 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Shelby County Legislation |