AL HB470 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Class 7 municipalities, council manager form of government, alternate procedure for adoption to be operative in November 2012, referendum prior to January 1, 2011, Sec. 11-43A-3.3 added; Secs. 11-43A-16, 11-43A-18, 11-43A-32 am'd.
Title
Class 7 municipalities, council manager form of government, alternate procedure for adoption to be operative in November 2012, referendum prior to January 1, 2011, Sec. 11-43A-3.3 added; Secs. 11-43A-16, 11-43A-18, 11-43A-32 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely Postponed | |
2010-03-03 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-28 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |