AL HB423 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Delivered to Governor at 5:17 p.m. on April 20, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Delivered to Governor at 5:17 p.m. on April 20, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public contracts, wireless telecommunications contracts, further provided, Secs. 41-16-27, 41-16-51 am'd.
Title
Public contracts, wireless telecommunications contracts, further provided, Secs. 41-16-27, 41-16-51 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1047 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SBIR: Waggoner motion to Adopt Roll Call 1046 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 686 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 685 (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - HBIR: Treadaway motion to Adopt Roll Call 684 (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SBIR: Waggoner motion to Adopt Roll Call 1046 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 686 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 685 (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - HBIR: Treadaway motion to Adopt Roll Call 684 (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 5:17 p.m. on April 20, 2021. |
2021-04-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-294. |
2021-04-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-04-20 | House | Enrolled |
2021-04-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1047 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2021-04-07 | House | Engrossed |
2021-04-07 | House | Givan intended to vote "Yea" |
2021-04-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 686 |
2021-04-07 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 685 |
2021-04-07 | House | State Government Amendment Offered |
2021-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-02-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 16 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 16 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |