AL HB344 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-24 - Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-24 - Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Trapping of fur-bearing animals, licensing, use of plastic tags on traps and the requirement that the license number of the owner of a trap be contained on any tag, deleted, Sec. 9-11-59 am'd.
Title
Trapping of fur-bearing animals, licensing, use of plastic tags on traps and the requirement that the license number of the owner of a trap be contained on any tag, deleted, Sec. 9-11-59 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Governmental Affairs | |
2012-04-24 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-03 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs | |
2012-04-03 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 554 | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-23 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-16 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry |