AL HB32 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Delivered to Governor at 6:49 p.m. on August 10, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Conservation and Natural Resources Department, rule prohibiting transportation and release of feral swine, penalty increased, mandatory minimum fine, Sec. 9-11-72 added

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Conservation and Natural Resources Department, rule prohibiting transportation and release of feral swine, penalty increased, mandatory minimum fine, Sec. 9-11-72 added

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-08-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-10HouseDelivered to Governor at 6:49 p.m. on August 10, 2015.
2015-08-10HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-519.
2015-08-10HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-08-10HouseEnrolled
2015-08-10SenateSignature Requested
2015-08-10HousePassed Second House
2015-08-10SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 58
2015-08-10SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-08-10SenateWilliams motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2015-08-10SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2015-08-07SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-06SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2015-08-05HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 19
2015-08-05HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-08-04HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-03HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback