AL HB300 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Forwarded to Governor on March 17, 2022 at 1:49 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Forwarded to Governor on March 17, 2022 at 1:49 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Baldwin Co., sheriff, service of process fee increased, distribution and use of funds further provided for, Sec. 45-2-231.90 am'd.
Title
Baldwin Co., sheriff, service of process fee increased, distribution and use of funds further provided for, Sec. 45-2-231.90 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 640 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 639 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 248 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 63 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-02-17 - House - HBIR: Shiver motion to Adopt Roll Call 247 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 39 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 639 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 248 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 63 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-02-17 - House - HBIR: Shiver motion to Adopt Roll Call 247 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 39 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Forwarded to Governor on March 17, 2022 at 1:49 p.m. |
2022-03-17 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-172. |
2022-03-17 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-03-17 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-03-17 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 640 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2022-02-17 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 248 |
2022-02-17 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation |