AL HB245 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-17 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-17 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, rules of the road, construction zone violations, penalties further provided, Sec. 32-5A-176.1 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicles, rules of the road, construction zone violations, penalties further provided, Sec. 32-5A-176.1 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Greer [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 474 (Y: 83 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - HBIR: Greer motion to Adopt Roll Call 473 (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - HBIR: Greer motion to Adopt Roll Call 473 (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Further Consideration |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Allen motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy |
2021-03-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 474 |
2021-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |
Same As/Similar To
SB4 (Same As) 2021-05-17 - Assigned Act No. 2021-482.