AL HB179 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To alter, rearrange, and extend the boundary lines and corporate limits of the Town of Hayden in Blount County.
Title
To alter, rearrange, and extend the boundary lines and corporate limits of the Town of Hayden in Blount County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 842 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 77 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2024-02-28 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 42 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 77 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2024-02-28 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 42 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | House | Enacted |
2024-05-07 | House | Enacted |
2024-04-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2024-04-30 | House | Enrolled |
2024-04-30 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 842 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Pending Senate Local Legislation |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation |
2024-02-28 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 137 |
2024-02-28 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-27 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-27 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-15 | House | Pending House Local Legislation |
2024-02-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Local Legislation |