AL HB15 | 2016 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-25 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resisting arrest, arrest only if perpetrator is concurrently arrested for a separate unrelated crime, Sec. 13A-10-41 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resisting arrest, arrest only if perpetrator is concurrently arrested for a separate unrelated crime, Sec. 13A-10-41 am'd.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-25HouseFurther Consideration
2016-08-25HouseMartin motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2016-08-25HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2016-08-24HouseMartin motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2016-08-24HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2016-08-23HouseMartin motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2016-08-23HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2016-08-19HouseMartin motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2016-08-19HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2016-08-18HouseMartin motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2016-08-18HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2016-08-17HouseMartin motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2016-08-17HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2016-08-16HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-08-15HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback