AL HB111 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation Department, director authorized to appoint assistant counsel subject to State Merit System, Sec. 23-1-26 am'd.
Title
Transportation Department, director authorized to appoint assistant counsel subject to State Merit System, Sec. 23-1-26 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Love [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 847 |
2013-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-14 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |