AK SR2 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-18 - PERMANENTLY FILED 11/13 SENATE RESOLVE 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a Senate Special Committee on the Arctic.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Special Committee On The Arctic

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-18SenatePERMANENTLY FILED 11/13 SENATE RESOLVE 2
2017-04-12SenateMEMBER CHANGE: BISHOP REPLACES DUNLEAVY
2017-01-25Senate3:39 PM 1/25/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2017-01-17SenateMEMBERS: GEISSEL (CHAIR), KELLY, DUNLEAVY, HOFFMAN, OLSON
2017-01-17SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2017-01-17SenateBEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
2017-01-17SenateTAKEN UP UC
2017-01-17SenateFN1: ZERO(S.RLS)
2017-01-17SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback