AK SJR6 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-10 - PERMANENTLY FILED 6/20 LEGIS RESOLVE 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Urging the United States Congress not to relinquish to the office of the President of the United States the legislative duty to safeguard one of our most fundamental rights; and urging the President of the United States to refrain from any further efforts to restrict ownership of firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oppose Executive Orders On Gun Control

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendments to SJR 6? (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-10SenatePERMANENTLY FILED 6/20 LEGIS RESOLVE 3
2013-03-25Senate11:13 AM 3/22/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2013-03-19SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y18 N1 E1
2013-03-19SenateREAD AND TAKEN UP
2013-03-18HouseVERSION: HCS SJR 6(JUD) AM H
2013-03-18HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2013-03-18HouseRECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
2013-03-15HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): ISAACSON, LYNN, JOHNSON, NEUMAN, LEDOUX, P.WILSON
2013-03-15HouseKERTTULA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2013-03-15HousePASSED Y32 N2 E6
2013-03-15HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS SJR 6(JUD) AM H
2013-03-15HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2013-03-15HouseAM NO 3 NOT OFFERED
2013-03-15House...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION (TECHNICAL)
2013-03-15HouseAM NO 2 ADOPTED Y20 N14 E6
2013-03-15HouseAM NO 1 NOT OFFERED
2013-03-15HouseJUD HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2013-03-15HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2013-03-15HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/15/2013
2013-03-05HouseFN1: ZERO(S.JUD)
2013-03-05HouseNR: GRUENBERG
2013-03-05HouseDP: MILLETT, PRUITT, LYNN, FOSTER, KELLER
2013-03-05HouseJUD RPT HCS(JUD) 5DP 1NR
2013-03-04HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): KELLER
2013-02-22HouseJUD
2013-02-22HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2013-02-20SenateVERSION: SJR 6
2013-02-20SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2013-02-20SenatePASSED Y19 N1
2013-02-20SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SJR 6
2013-02-20SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2013-02-20SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2013-02-20SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 2/20/2013
2013-02-11SenateFN1: ZERO(S.JUD)
2013-02-11SenateDP: COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI, DYSON
2013-02-11SenateJUD RPT 3DP
2013-01-25SenateJUD
2013-01-25SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback