AK SJR24 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-02 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to certain holiday practices at federal Veterans Health Administration facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans Health Administration Policies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSJR 24(STA)? (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-02SenateDUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14
2014-07-02Senate9:25 AM 7/2 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2014-05-20SenateMANIFEST ERROR(S) - SEE FULL TEXT ABOVE
2014-04-15SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- A1
2014-04-15SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ
2014-04-15HouseVERSION: HCS CSSJR 24(MLV)
2014-04-15HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2014-04-15HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN, TUCK, JOSEPHSON, KAWASAKI
2014-04-15HousePASSED Y36 N1 E3
2014-04-15HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSJR 24(MLV)
2014-04-15HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-15HouseMLV HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-15HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2014-04-15HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2014
2014-04-13HouseFN1: ZERO(S.STA)
2014-04-13HouseDP: GRUENBERG, HIGGINS, REINBOLD, HUGHES, SADDLER, LEDOUX
2014-04-13HouseMLV RPT HCS(MLV) 6DP
2014-04-03HouseMLV
2014-04-03HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2014-04-02SenateVERSION: CSSJR 24(STA)
2014-04-02SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2014-04-02SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2014-04-02SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 24(STA)
2014-04-02SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-02SenateSTA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-02SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2014-04-02SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/2/2014
2014-03-12SenateFN1: ZERO(S.STA)
2014-03-12SenateDP: DYSON, WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL, GIESSEL
2014-03-12SenateSTA RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE
2014-02-14SenateCOSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, MICCICHE, KELLY, BISHOP, GIESSEL, MEYER, DUNLEAVY
2014-02-14SenateSTA
2014-02-14SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback