AK SJR22 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-16 - PERMANENTLY FILED 4/15 LEGIS RESOLVE 33
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-16 - PERMANENTLY FILED 4/15 LEGIS RESOLVE 33
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Opposing litigation that seeks to eliminate the Kenai, Kasilof, and Chitina sockeye salmon personal use dip net fisheries.
Title
Federal Preemption Of Salmon Management
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-16 | PERMANENTLY FILED 4/15 LEGIS RESOLVE 33 | |
2010-03-30 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2010-03-30 | 12:15 PM 3/30/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-03-24 | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N1 | |
2010-03-24 | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP | |
2010-03-23 | VERSION: HCS CSSJR 22(FSH) | |
2010-03-23 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED | |
2010-03-23 | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y36 N1 E2 A1 | |
2010-03-23 | RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING | |
2010-03-22 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GATTO | |
2010-03-22 | TAKE UP RECON SAME DAY WITHDRAWN | |
2010-03-22 | KERTTULA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION | |
2010-03-22 | PASSED Y36 N4 | |
2010-03-22 | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSJR 22(FSH) | |
2010-03-22 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-22 | FSH HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-22 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-22 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG | |
2010-03-10 | FN2: ZERO(H.FSH) | |
2010-03-10 | AM: KAWASAKI | |
2010-03-10 | NR: OLSON, EDGMON, SEATON, P.WILSON | |
2010-03-10 | DP: GUTTENBERG, TUCK, NEUMAN, JOHNSON | |
2010-03-10 | RES RPT HCS(FSH) 4DP 4NR 1AM | |
2010-02-10 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, MILLETT, KELLER | |
2010-02-10 | FN2: ZERO(H.FSH) | |
2010-02-10 | AM: KAWASAKI | |
2010-02-10 | NR: BUCH, EDGMON | |
2010-02-10 | DP: JOHNSON, MILLETT, KELLER, MUNOZ | |
2010-02-10 | FSH RPT HCS(FSH) 4DP 2NR 1AM | |
2010-02-08 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI | |
2010-02-03 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA | |
2009-04-18 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): NEUMAN, STOLTZE | |
2009-04-18 | FSH, RES | |
2009-04-18 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-04-17 | VERSION: CSSJR 22(RES) | |
2009-04-17 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2009-04-17 | PASSED Y17 N2 V1 | |
2009-04-17 | MENARD, DYSON WITHDRAWN AS COSPONSORS | |
2009-04-17 | COSPONSOR(S): PASKVAN, MCGUIRE, MEYER, DAVIS, BUNDE | |
2009-04-17 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 22(RES) | |
2009-04-17 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-17 | RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-17 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-04-17 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2009 | |
2009-04-16 | JUD REFERRAL WAIVED | |
2009-04-16 | FN1: ZERO(LEG) | |
2009-04-16 | NR: STEVENS, WAGONER | |
2009-04-16 | DP: MCGUIRE, WIELECHOWSKI, HUGGINS | |
2009-04-16 | RES RPT CS 3DP 2NR NEW TITLE | |
2009-04-15 | COSPONSOR(S): THERRIAULT, DYSON | |
2009-04-10 | COSPONSOR(S): THOMAS | |
2009-04-09 | RES, JUD | |
2009-04-09 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Attorney General
Fish & Game (fish)
Intergovernmental Relations
Limited Entry
Regulations
Resources
Subsistence
Fish & Game (fish)
Intergovernmental Relations
Limited Entry
Regulations
Resources
Subsistence