AK SJR17 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - PERMANENTLY FILED 3/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - PERMANENTLY FILED 3/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Welcoming the Arctic Council Task Force for Arctic Marine Oil Pollution Preparedness and Response to the state for its March 2012 meeting and urging the task force to use its time in the state to inform and inspire the work of the task force.
Title
Arctic Council Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | PERMANENTLY FILED 3/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 29 | |
2012-03-19 | 9:32 AM 3/19/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2012-03-16 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG, HERRON, JOHNSON, KAWASAKI, MILLETT, HOLMES | |
2012-03-16 | VERSION: SJR 17 | |
2012-03-16 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2012-03-16 | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y38 E2 | |
2012-03-16 | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC | |
2012-03-16 | KERTTULA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION | |
2012-03-16 | PASSED Y37 E2 A1 | |
2012-03-16 | READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 17 | |
2012-03-16 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-03-16 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-03-16 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/16/2012 | |
2012-03-15 | FN1: ZERO(S.STA) | |
2012-03-15 | DP: MUNOZ, HERRON, KAWASAKI, DICK, FEIGE, SEATON | |
2012-03-15 | RES RPT 6DP | |
2012-03-05 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KERTTULA | |
2012-03-05 | RES | |
2012-03-05 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2012-03-05 | VERSION: SJR 17 | |
2012-03-05 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2012-03-05 | PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1 | |
2012-03-05 | GIESSEL, DYSON, WAGONER, STEVENS, THOMAS | |
2012-03-05 | COSPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, DAVIS, EGAN, PASKVAN, MENARD, ELLIS, MEYER, HUGGINS, | |
2012-03-05 | READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 17 | |
2012-03-05 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-03-05 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-03-05 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/5/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | FN1: ZERO(S.STA) | |
2012-02-29 | DP: WIELECHOWSKI, KOOKESH, PASKVAN, MEYER, GIESSEL | |
2012-02-29 | STA RPT 5DP | |
2012-02-06 | STA | |
2012-02-06 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Economic Development
Environmental Concerns
Hazardous Substances
Intergovernmental Relations
International Relations
Oil & Gas
Transportation
Vessels
Environmental Concerns
Hazardous Substances
Intergovernmental Relations
International Relations
Oil & Gas
Transportation
Vessels