AK SB64 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-28 - MANIFEST ERROR(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-28 - MANIFEST ERROR(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act adopting the Uniform Environmental Covenants Act; relating to environmental real property covenants and notices of activity and use limitation at contaminated sites to ensure the protection of human health, safety, and welfare, and the environment; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Adopt Uniform Environmental Covenants Act
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Micciche [R] | Rep. Sam Kito [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to SB 64 Effective Date (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2018-05-10 | Senate | AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV |
2018-05-10 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-05-10 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y17 N2 E1 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2018-05-09 | House | VERSION: HCS SB 64(RLS) |
2018-05-09 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2018-05-09 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y36 N4 |
2018-05-09 | House | PASSED Y34 N6 |
2018-05-09 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2018-05-09 | House | AM NO 2 FAILED Y18 N21 A1 |
2018-05-09 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y18 N21 A1 |
2018-05-09 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMS 1 & 2 UC |
2018-05-09 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 64(RLS) |
2018-05-08 | House | ADJOURNED TO 5/9 CALENDAR |
2018-05-07 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/8 CALENDAR |
2018-05-07 | House | RLS HCS ADOPTED UC |
2018-05-07 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-07 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2018 |
2018-05-07 | House | FN4: ZERO(DNR) |
2018-05-07 | House | FN3: ZERO(DEC) |
2018-05-07 | House | NR: CHENAULT, KITO, MILLETT, EASTMAN, LEDOUX |
2018-05-07 | House | DP: CLAMAN, STUTES |
2018-05-07 | House | RLS RPT HCS(RLS) 2DP 5NR |
2018-02-07 | House | FN4: ZERO(DNR) |
2018-02-07 | House | FN3: ZERO(DEC) |
2018-02-07 | House | NR: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, STUTES, KNOPP, JOSEPHSON, WOOL |
2018-02-07 | House | DP: BIRCH, KITO |
2018-02-07 | House | L&C RPT HCS(L&C) 2DP 5NR |
2017-04-15 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KITO |
2017-04-13 | House | FN2: ZERO(DNR) |
2017-04-13 | House | FN1: ZERO(DEC) |
2017-04-13 | House | NR: RAUSCHER |
2017-04-13 | House | DP: WESTLAKE, TALERICO, FANSLER, PARISH |
2017-04-13 | House | CRA RPT 4DP 1NR |
2017-03-29 | House | CRA, L&C |
2017-03-29 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-03-27 | Senate | VERSION: SB 64 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2017-03-27 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-03-27 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N1 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 64 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2017-03-27 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-03-27 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DNR) |
2017-03-20 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DEC) |
2017-03-20 | Senate | DP: STEVENS |
2017-03-20 | Senate | NR: COSTELLO, HUGHES, GARDNER |
2017-03-20 | Senate | L&C RPT 1DP 3NR |
2017-03-08 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DNR) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DEC) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | NR: MACKINNON, STEDMAN |
2017-03-08 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, HOFFMAN |
2017-03-08 | Senate | CRA RPT 2DP 2NR |
2017-02-17 | Senate | CRA, L&C |
2017-02-17 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Appeals
Boards & Commissions
Buildings
Civil Procedure
Compacts
Condominiums
Construction
Contracts
Cooperatives
Court Rules
Courts
Easements
Environmental Concerns
Fees
Funds
Hearings
Housing
Insurance
Liability
Liens
Permits
Planning
Regulations
Safety
Taxation
Zoning
Boards & Commissions
Buildings
Civil Procedure
Compacts
Condominiums
Construction
Contracts
Cooperatives
Court Rules
Courts
Easements
Environmental Concerns
Fees
Funds
Hearings
Housing
Insurance
Liability
Liens
Permits
Planning
Regulations
Safety
Taxation
Zoning