AK SB39 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-23 - COSPONSOR(S) WITHDRAWN: MCGUIRE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-23 - COSPONSOR(S) WITHDRAWN: MCGUIRE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act ratifying an interstate compact to elect the President and Vice-President of the United States by national popular vote; and making related changes to statutes applicable to the selection by voters of electors for candidates for President and Vice-President of the United States and to the duties of those electors.
Title
U.s. Presidential Election Compact
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-23 | COSPONSOR(S) WITHDRAWN: MCGUIRE | |
2011-03-21 | COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS | |
2011-02-28 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2011-02-28 | FN1: ZERO(GOV) | |
2011-02-28 | NR: WIELECHOWSKI, PASKVAN | |
2011-02-28 | DNP: COGHILL | |
2011-02-28 | DP: FRENCH | |
2011-02-28 | JUD RPT 1DP 1DNP 2NR | |
2011-02-11 | FN1: ZERO(GOV) | |
2011-02-11 | NR: WIELECHOWSKI, PASKVAN, MEYER | |
2011-02-11 | DNP: GIESSEL | |
2011-02-11 | STA RPT 1DNP 3NR | |
2011-01-31 | COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE | |
2011-01-19 | STA, JUD, FIN | |
2011-01-19 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-01-19 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/14/11 |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=27&bill=SB39 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/27/Bills/SB0039A.PDF |